Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Recanati

Dioecesis Recinetensis

United

To: Diocese of Macerata-Tolentino-Recanati-Cingoli-Treia



Show: All | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Historical Details


Past Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Recanati
22 November 1239ErectedDiocese of Recanati (erected)
Diocese of Recanati e Loreto
9 February 1592UnitedDiocese of Loreto
Diocese of Recanati
Diocese of Recanati e Loreto
Diocese of Recanati
15 September 1934Name ChangedDiocese of Recanati e Loreto Diocese of Recanati
25 January 1985UnitedDiocese of Macerata e Tolentino
Diocese of Osimo e Cingoli
Diocese of Recanati
Diocese of San Severino (-Treia)
Diocese of Macerata-Tolentino-Recanati-Cingoli-Treia

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Recanati
195050,60750,70799.8%629015233217523527ap1951
197045,18645,186100.0%393271636378825ap1971
198047,97447,990100.0%403373657377927ap1981

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 21 Jul 2014