Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lorenzo Gherardi

Deceased

Bishop of Recanati e Loreto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Aug 1645³BornMonte Alboddo
8 Jun 169347.8AppointedBishop of Recanati e Loreto, Italy
14 Jun 169347.8Ordained BishopBishop of Recanati e Loreto, Italy
5 Apr 172781.6DiedBishop of Recanati e Loreto, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Gherardi:
Bishop Lorenzo Gherardi (born , died ) Bishop of Recanati e Loreto

  • a bishop for 33.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1726
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 330
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1693, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 28 Apr 2015