Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Domenico Cardinal de Cupis

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

Administrator of Adria

Archpriest of the Arcibasilica di San Giovanni in Laterano {Saint John Lateran Basilica}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1493BornRome
1 Jul 151724.5Elevated to Cardinal
6 Jul 151724.5InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Giovanni a Porta Latina
30 Jul 151724.6AppointedAdministrator of Trani, Italy
1 Jan 152229.0AppointedAdministrator of Recanati, Italy
17 Aug 152431.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Apollinare
1528²35.0AppointedAdministrator of Macerata, Italy
31 Aug 152835.7AppointedAdministrator of Adria, Italy
24 May 152936.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina
3 Sep 152936.7ResignedCardinal-Priest of San Giovanni a Porta Latina
22 Sep 153138.7AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
21 Dec 153139.0Ordained BishopCardinal-Bishop of Albano
15 Jan 153239.0AppointedBishop of Narḍ, Italy
13 Nov 153239.9AppointedAdministrator of Montepeloso, Italy
16 Dec 153240.0AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
153542.0AppointedArchpriest of the Arcibasilica di San Giovanni in Laterano {Saint John Lateran Basilica}
29 Jan 153542.1ResignedAdministrator of Macerata, Italy
26 Feb 153542.2AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
5 Jul 153542.5AppointedAdministrator of Camerino, Italy
22 May 153643.4ResignedBishop of Narḍ, Italy
5 Mar 153744.2ResignedAdministrator of Camerino, Italy
11 Apr 153744.3ResignedAdministrator of Montepeloso, Italy
28 Nov 153744.9AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)
25 Feb 154855.1ResignedAdministrator of Recanati, Italy
3 Jul 155158.5ResignedAdministrator of Trani, Italy
1552²59.0AppointedAdministrator of Recanati, Italy
6 Mar 155360.2ResignedAdministrator of Recanati, Italy
10 Oct 155360.8ResignedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina
10 Dec 155360.9DiedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Domenico de Cupis:
Cardinal Giovanni Domenico de Cupis (died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

  • a bishop for 22.0 years
  • a cardinal for 36.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1 Jul 1517
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 231, and Page 281
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 95, and Page 256
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 149

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 17 Nov 2013