Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Frederic de Nicolo

Deceased

Bishop of Rimini, Italy

Bishop of Senigallia


Events

DateEventTitle
1301¹AppointedBishop of Recanati, Italy
12 Nov 1301Ordained BishopBishop of Recanati, Italy
6 Jun 1323AppointedBishop of Senigallia, Italy
21 Oct 1328AppointedBishop of Rimini, Italy
1329¹DiedBishop of Rimini, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Frederic de Nicolo
Bishop Frederic de Nicolo (died 1329) Bishop of Rimini

EventPlace
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 27.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 410, and Page 447
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 107
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 102, Number 8,787

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 22 Dec 2020

Quantcast