Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Cardinal Vitelleschi

Deceased

Titular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}

Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina

Administrator of Trogir (Trał)


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Apr 1431AppointedBishop of Recanati, Italy
21 Feb 1435AppointedTitular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}
12 Oct 1435AppointedArchbishop of Firenze {Florence}, Italy
9 Aug 1437AppointedAdministrator of Trogir (Trał), Croatia
9 Aug 1437AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina
9 Aug 1437Elevated to Cardinal
2 Apr 1440DiedTitular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Vitelleschi
Giovanni Cardinal Vitelleschi (died ) Titular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCorneto

  • a cardinal for 2.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 154, and Page 253
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 9 Aug 1437

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast