Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giacinto Cordella

Deceased

Bishop of Recanati e Loreto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1603¹BornFermo
1 Oct 163532.7AppointedBishop of Venafro, Italy
28 Oct 163532.8Ordained BishopBishop of Venafro, Italy
15 Dec 166663.9AppointedBishop of Recanati e Loreto, Italy
15 Nov 167572.8DiedBishop of Recanati e Loreto, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giacinto Cordella:
Bishop Giacinto Cordella (born 1603, died ) Bishop of Recanati e Loreto

  • a bishop for 40.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 361, and Page 293
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 96, Number 579
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1635, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 23 Jun 2015