Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guarnerio Guarnieri

Deceased

Bishop of Recanati e Loreto


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Oct 1655Ordained PriestPriest
25 Oct 1655AppointedBishop of Segni, Italy
4 May 1682AppointedBishop of Recanati e Loreto, Italy
30 Dec 1689DiedBishop of Recanati e Loreto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Guarnerio Guarnieri:
Bishop Guarnerio Guarnieri (died ) Bishop of Recanati e Loreto

  • a priest for 34.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 315

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013