Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emilio Baroncelli

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Recanati

Titular Bishop of Forum Clodii


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Sep 1892BornPofi
24 Aug 191724.9Ordained PriestPriest of Veroli, Italy
22 Jan 194350.3AppointedBishop of Veroli, Italy
14 Feb 194350.4Ordained BishopBishop of Veroli, Italy
12 Aug 195562.9AppointedBishop of Recanati, Italy
15 Feb 196875.4RetiredBishop of Recanati, Italy
15 Feb 196875.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Forum Clodii
6 Dec 197280.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Recanati, Italy

MicroData Summary for Emilio Baroncelli:
Bishop Emilio Baroncelli (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Recanati

  • a priest for 55.3 years
  • a bishop for 29.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1943, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013