Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Monalduzio Leopardi

Deceased

Bishop of Osimo e Cingoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jul 1884BornRecanati
25 May 190722.8Ordained PriestPriest
26 May 192237.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Recanati e Loreto, Italy
26 May 192237.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Leptis Magna
9 Jul 192237.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Leptis Magna
20 Dec 192642.4AppointedBishop of Osimo e Cingoli, Italy
13 Jul 192743.0InstalledBishop of Osimo e Cingoli, Italy
17 May 194459.8DiedBishop of Osimo e Cingoli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Monalduzio Leopardi:
Bishop Monalduzio Leopardi (born , died ) Bishop of Osimo e Cingoli

  • a priest for 37.0 years
  • a bishop for 21.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1922, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013