Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Orlandoni

Bishop Emeritus of Senigallia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Mar 1939 Born
4 Apr 196526.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Recanati, Italy
11 Sep 196526.4Ordained PriestPriest of Recanati, Italy
25 Jan 198545.8IncardinatedPriest of Macerata-Tolentino-Recanati-Cingoli-Treia, Italy
21 Jan 199757.8AppointedBishop of Senigallia, Italy
5 Apr 199758.0Ordained BishopBishop of Senigallia, Italy
13 Apr 199758.0InstalledBishop of Senigallia, Italy
17 Oct 201576.5RetiredBishop of Senigallia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Orlandoni (VIAF: 48055805)
Bishop Giuseppe Orlandoni (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Senigallia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastelfidardo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Senigallia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Number 12,990
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 215, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 17 Oct 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast