Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Filippo Roccabella

Deceased

Bishop of Recanati


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Jan 1546AppointedBishop of Macerata, Italy
22 Aug 1546Ordained BishopBishop of Macerata, Italy
6 Mar 1553AppointedBishop of Recanati, Italy
1571²DiedBishop of Recanati, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Filippo Roccabella:
Bishop Filippo Roccabella , Bishop of Recanati

  • a bishop for 24.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 231, and Page 281
  • ob/c2+: CB, 18 Jul 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 21 Jul 2014