Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Campagnoli

Deceased

Bishop of Recanati e Loreto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Sep 1684³BornCento
7 Mar 171732.4Ordained PriestPriest
28 Mar 174661.5AppointedBishop of Recanati e Loreto, Italy
12 Apr 174661.5Ordained BishopBishop of Recanati e Loreto, Italy
25 Jun 174964.7DiedBishop of Recanati e Loreto, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Campagnoli:
Bishop Giovanni Battista Campagnoli (born , died ) Bishop of Recanati e Loreto

  • a priest for 32.2 years
  • a bishop for 3.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 354
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1746, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015