Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henri-Gaston de Lévis-Léran

Deceased

Bishop of Pamiers


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Aug 1702BornLéran
20 Aug 174139.0SelectedBishop of Pamiers, France
20 Dec 174139.3ConfirmedBishop of Pamiers, France
11 Feb 174239.5Ordained BishopBishop of Pamiers, France
28 Jan 178784.4DiedBishop of Pamiers, France

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Henri-Gaston de Lévis-Léran:
Bishop Henri-Gaston de Lévis-Léran (born , died ) Bishop of Pamiers

  • a bishop for 44.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 91
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1742, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015