Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean de Sponde

Deceased

Bishop of Pamiers


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1594¹BornMauleon
20 Feb 163440.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Pamiers, France
20 Feb 163440.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Megara
2 Jul 163440.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Megara
25 Feb 164147.1SucceededBishop of Pamiers, France
31 Mar 164349.2DiedBishop of Pamiers, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean de Sponde:
Bishop Jean de Sponde (died ) Bishop of Pamiers

  • a bishop for 8.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 88, and Page 237
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1634, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 15 Mar 2015