Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Amanieu Cardinal d’Albret

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of San Nicola in Carcere

Administrator of Bazas

Administrator of Pamplona

Administrator of Pamiers


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1478Born
19 Jul 149921.5AppointedAdministrator of (Saint-Bertrand de) Comminges, France
20 Mar 150022.2Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
4 May 150022.3AppointedAdministrator of Oloron (Oloron-Sainte-Marie), France
28 Sep 150022.7Elevated to Cardinal
5 Oct 150022.7InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Nicola in Carcere
10 Oct 150022.7ResignedAdministrator of Oloron (Oloron-Sainte-Marie), France
14 Mar 150224.2AppointedAdministrator of Pamiers, France
8 Jan 150426.0AppointedAdministrator of Vannes, France
14 Oct 150426.7ResignedAdministrator of Vannes, France
4 Dec 150426.9AppointedAdministrator of Bazas, France
150628.0ResignedAdministrator of Pamiers, France
6 Oct 150729.7AppointedAdministrator of Lescar, France
13 May 151032.3AppointedAdministrator of Pamplona, Spain
151234.0ResignedAdministrator of Pamplona, Spain
1514¹36.0ResignedAdministrator of (Saint-Bertrand de) Comminges, France
15 May 151436.3AppointedAdministrator of Pamiers, France
18 Aug 151436.6ResignedAdministrator of Pamiers, France
20 Jun 151537.4AppointedAdministrator of (Saint-Lizier de) Couserans (or Conserans), France
23 Jun 151537.4AppointedAdministrator of Pamiers, France
25 Jun 151537.4ResignedAdministrator of (Saint-Lizier de) Couserans (or Conserans), France
151739.0AppointedAdministrator of Pamplona, Spain
20 Dec 152042.9DiedCardinal-Deacon of San Nicola in Carcere

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Amanieu d’Albret
Amanieu Cardinal d’Albret (born 1478, died ) Cardinal-Deacon of San Nicola in Carcere

  • a cardinal for 20.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 20 Mar 1500
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 249, Number 2
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 176, and Page 177

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 27 May 2018

Quantcast