Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henri de Sponde

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Pamiers


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1568BornMauléon
20 Jul 162658.5AppointedBishop of Pamiers, France
16 Aug 162658.6Ordained BishopBishop of Pamiers, France
25 Feb 164173.1ResignedBishop of Pamiers, France
18 May 164375.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Pamiers, France

MicroData Summary for Henri de Sponde:
Bishop Henri de Sponde (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Pamiers

  • a bishop for 16.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 88
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1626, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 21 Mar 2015