Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis-Charles-François de La Tour-Landorte

Deceased

Bishop of Pamiers


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jan 1760BornSaint-Ignan
15 Apr 178626.2Ordained PriestPriest
12 Feb 182363.0SelectedBishop of Pamiers, France
16 May 182363.3ConfirmedBishop of Pamiers, France
13 Jul 182363.4Ordained BishopBishop of Pamiers, France
11 Jan 183574.9DiedBishop of Pamiers, France

MicroData Summary for Louis-Charles-François de La Tour-Landorte
Bishop Louis-Charles-François de La Tour-Landorte (born , died ) Bishop of Pamiers

  • a priest for 48.7 years
  • a bishop for 11.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 81
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1823, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 27 May 2016