Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Baptiste Anouilh, C.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Southwestern Chi-Li {Ce-Li Meridio-Occidentale}, China

Titular Bishop of Abydus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Nov 1819Born
19 Jul 184525.6ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Mission
6 Jun 184626.5Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
28 Mar 184828.3AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Peking [Beijing], China
28 Mar 184828.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Abydus
22 Jun 185131.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Abydus
14 Dec 185839.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Southwestern Chi-Li {Ce-Li Meridio-Occidentale}, China
18 Feb 186949.2DiedVicar Apostolic of Southwestern Chi-Li {Ce-Li Meridio-Occidentale}, China

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste Anouilh (VIAF: 15928615)
Bishop Jean-Baptiste Anouilh C.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Southwestern Chi-Li {Ce-Li Meridio-Occidentale}

EventPlace
Birth PlacePrat-et-Bonrepaux, Diocese of Pamiers, France
Ordained BishopSiao-Yug-ly
Death PlaceTcheng-ting-fu

  • a priest for 22.6 years
  • a bishop for 17.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 71
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,851, Number 32
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 26 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast