Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoine Champion

Deceased

Bishop of Genève {Geneva}, Switzerland


Events

DateEventTitle
26 Nov 1484AppointedBishop of Mondovi, Italy
5 Nov 1490AppointedBishop of Genève {Geneva}, Switzerland
29 Jul 1495DiedBishop of Genève {Geneva}, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Antoine Champion
Bishop Antoine Champion (died ) Bishop of Genève {Geneva}

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 196, and Page 158
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1484, Number 58*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 17 Dec 2018

Quantcast