Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Tommaso Ghilardi, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Mondovi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Oct 1800BornCasalgrasso
28 May 182524.6Ordained PriestPriest
14 Mar 184241.4SelectedBishop of Mondovi, Italy
23 May 184241.6ConfirmedBishop of Mondovi, Italy
5 Jun 184241.6Ordained BishopBishop of Mondovi, Italy
6 Jun 187372.6DiedBishop of Mondovi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Tommaso Ghilardi:
Bishop Giovanni Tommaso Ghilardi O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Mondovi

  • a priest for 48.0 years
  • a bishop for 31.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 272

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013