Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Brustia

Deceased

Bishop of Mondovi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Nov 1907Born
29 Jun 193224.6Ordained PriestPriest of Novara, Italy
14 Mar 195749.3AppointedBishop of Andria, Italy
5 May 195749.4Ordained BishopBishop of Andria, Italy
29 Mar 196961.3ResignedBishop of Andria, Italy
29 Mar 196961.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Sinna
15 Jan 197062.1AppointedBishop of Mondovi, Italy
17 Jun 197567.6DiedBishop of Mondovi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Brustia
Bishop Francesco Brustia (born , died ) Bishop of Mondovi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBarengo

  • a priest for 42.9 years
  • a bishop for 18.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast