Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Antonio Ripa

Deceased

Bishop of Mondovi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1582¹Born
19 Jan 163250.0AppointedBishop of Mondovi, Italy
25 Jan 163250.0Ordained BishopBishop of Mondovi, Italy
20 Sep 164159.7DiedBishop of Mondovi, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Carlo Antonio Ripa (VIAF: 304911690)
Bishop Carlo Antonio Ripa (born 1582, died ) Bishop of Mondovi

  • a bishop for 9.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 249
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 92, Number 548
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1632, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 7 Sep 2016