Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lorenzo Fieschi

Deceased

Bishop of Mondovi, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
28 Sep 1502AppointedBishop of Brugnato, Italy
14 Dec 1502Ordained BishopBishop of Brugnato, Italy
24 May 1510AppointedBishop of Ascoli Piceno, Italy
15 Oct 1512AppointedBishop of Mondovi, Italy
13 Feb 1519DiedBishop of Mondovi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Fieschi
Bishop Lorenzo Fieschi (died ) Bishop of Mondovi

EventPlace
Ordained BishopCathedral, Genova

  • a bishop for 16.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 141, and Page 250
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 119
  • ob/c2+: CB, 1 Jun 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,669
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1502, Number 4
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 111

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast