Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bartolomeo Ferrero

Deceased

Bishop of Aosta, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1550¹Born
6 Mar 157424.1Ordained PriestPriest
5 May 159545.3AppointedBishop of Aosta, Italy
16 May 159545.3Ordained BishopBishop of Aosta, Italy
4 Aug 160757.5DiedBishop of Aosta, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bartolomeo Ferrero
Bishop Bartolomeo Ferrero (born 1550, died ) Bishop of Aosta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMondovi, Diocese of Mondovi
Ordained BishopS.Silvestre au Quirinal, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 33.4 years
  • a bishop for 12.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 100
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1595, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast