Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giacinto Solaro di Moretta

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Mondovi

Titular Archbishop of Patrae (Veters)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1604¹BornMorettae
9 Jun 165955.4AppointedBishop of Nice, France
15 Jun 165955.4Ordained BishopBishop of Nice, France
23 Apr 166359.3AppointedBishop of Mondovi, Italy
27 Oct 166763.8ResignedBishop of Mondovi, Italy
23 Jan 166864.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Patrae (Veters)
1672¹68.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Mondovi, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giacinto Solaro di Moretta:
Archbishop Giacinto Solaro di Moretta , Bishop Emeritus of Mondovi

  • a bishop for 12.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 249, and Page 258
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 275, and Page 309
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1659, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 30 Mar 2015