Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jérôme de Langue, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop of (Saint-Lizier de) Couserans (or Conserans), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1535¹Born
29 Jan 159358.0AppointedBishop of (Saint-Lizier de) Couserans (or Conserans), France
14 Feb 159358.1Ordained BishopBishop of (Saint-Lizier de) Couserans (or Conserans), France
13 Nov 161277.8DiedBishop of (Saint-Lizier de) Couserans (or Conserans), France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jérôme de Langue
Bishop Jérôme de Langue O.F.M. Obs. (born 1535, died ) Bishop of (Saint-Lizier de) Couserans (or Conserans)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMondovi, Diocese of Mondovi, Italy
Ordained BishopS. Marie in Ara Coeli, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceS. Lizier, Ariege

  • a bishop for 19.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 160
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 176
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1593, Number 3
  • c3: CB, 4 Dec 2017
  • c3: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast