Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giambattista Isnardi de Castello

Deceased

Bishop of Mondovi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jun 1651³Born
23 May 167725.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
30 May 167725.9Ordained PriestPriest
26 Aug 169746.1AppointedBishop of Mondovi, Italy
1 Sep 169746.1Ordained BishopBishop of Mondovi, Italy
Aug 1732³81.0DiedBishop of Mondovi, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giambattista Isnardi de Castello
Bishop Giambattista Isnardi de Castello (born , died Aug 1732) Bishop of Mondovi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTurin

  • a priest for 55.1 years
  • a bishop for 34.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 275
  • c34: CB, 13 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1697, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast