Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sebastiano Dho

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Alba (Pompea), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 May 1935Born
29 Jun 195823.1Ordained PriestPriest of Mondovi, Italy
5 Jul 198651.1AppointedBishop of Saluzzo, Italy
24 Aug 198651.2Ordained BishopBishop of Saluzzo, Italy
3 Jul 199358.1AppointedBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy
11 Sep 199358.3InstalledBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy
28 Jun 201075.1RetiredBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy
31 Aug 202186.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Alba (Pompea), Italy

MicroData Summary for Sebastiano Dho
Bishop Sebastiano Dho (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Alba (Pompea)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFrabosa Soprana, Diocese of Mondovi
Ordained BishopAssumption, Cathedral, Saluzzo, Diocese of Saluzzo
Death PlaceIstituto Santa Teresa, Mondovi Piazza, Diocese of Mondovi
Buried Place (Original)Bishops' Crypt, Cathedral, Alba, Diocese of Alba (Pompea)

  • a priest for 63.1 years
  • a bishop for 35.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 28 Jun 2010
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 99, Number 8,548
  • d: CB, 31 Aug 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 6 Sep 2021

Quantcast