Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rocco Tornatore, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Eastern Burma {Birmania Orientale}, Myanmar

Titular Bishop of Castabala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jan 1836Born
11 Dec 188751.9AppointedPro-Vicar Apostolic of Eastern Burma {Birmania Orientale}, Myanmar
26 Nov 188953.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Eastern Burma {Birmania Orientale}, Myanmar
26 Nov 188953.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Castabala
8 Dec 189054.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Castabala
26 Jan 190872.0DiedVicar Apostolic of Eastern Burma {Birmania Orientale}, Myanmar

MicroData Summary for Rocco Tornatore
Bishop Rocco Tornatore M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Eastern Burma {Birmania Orientale}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGaressio Poggiolo, Diocese of Mondovi, Italy
Ordained BishopMandalay

  • a bishop for 17.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 190
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1890, Number 83

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 May 2017