Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Luigi Cardinal Oreglia di Santo Stefano

Deceased

Prefect of the Congregation of Ceremonies

Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

Abbot of Santi Vincenzo ed Anastasio alle tre Fontane

Chamberlain (Camerlengo) of the Apostolic Chamber


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jul 1828Born
22 Feb 185122.6Ordained PriestPriest
4 May 186637.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tamiathis
13 May 186637.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Tamiathis
15 May 186637.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Belgium
29 May 186839.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Portugal
22 Dec 187345.4Elevated to Cardinal
16 Jan 187445.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia
23 Dec 187648.4AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for Indulgences and Relics
22 Oct 187749.2AppointedAbbot of Santi Vincenzo ed Anastasio alle tre Fontane, Italy
27 Mar 188253.7AppointedChamberlain (Camerlengo) of the College of Cardinals
15 Mar 188354.6ResignedChamberlain (Camerlengo) of the College of Cardinals
24 Mar 188455.7AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
27 Mar 188556.7AppointedChamberlain (Camerlengo) of the Apostolic Chamber
24 May 188960.8AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
30 Nov 189668.3AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)
189768.4AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of Ceremonies
7 Dec 191385.4DiedPrefect of the Congregation of Ceremonies

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Luigi Oreglia di Santo Stefano (VIAF: 89262387)
Luigi Cardinal Oreglia di Santo Stefano (born , died ) Prefect of Ceremonies

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBene Vagienna, Diocese of Mondovi, Italy
Ordained BishopSt John Lateran, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Pontifical Urban Athenaeum of Propaganda Fide, Campo Verano, Cemetery, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 62.7 years
  • a bishop for 47.5 years
  • a cardinal for 39.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 239, and Page 44
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 45, and Page 46
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 62
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1866, Number 13
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 22 Dec 1873

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Feb 2017