Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Nicola Maurizio Fontana

Deceased

Archbishop of Oristano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Sep 1708BornMontis Regalis
30 May 173324.7Ordained PriestPriest
24 Dec 174335.3SelectedArchbishop of Oristano, Italy
3 Feb 174435.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Oristano, Italy
15 Mar 174435.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Oristano, Italy
1 Mar 174637.4DiedArchbishop of Oristano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Nicola Maurizio Fontana:
Archbishop Nicola Maurizio Fontana (born , died ) Archbishop of Oristano

  • a priest for 12.8 years
  • a bishop for 2.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 95
  • ob/c2+: CB, 13 Dec 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 14 Dec 2013