Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Gaetano Buglioni (Bullione di Monale)

Deceased

Bishop of Mondovi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Aug 1767Born
18 Dec 179023.3Ordained PriestPriest
20 Mar 182456.6SelectedBishop of Mondovi, Italy
12 Jul 182456.9ConfirmedBishop of Mondovi, Italy
19 Sep 182457.1Ordained BishopBishop of Mondovi, Italy
10 Feb 184274.5DiedBishop of Mondovi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Gaetano Buglioni (Bullione di Monale)
Bishop Francesco Gaetano Buglioni (Bullione di Monale) (born , died ) Bishop of Mondovi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaluzzo

  • a priest for 51.1 years
  • a bishop for 17.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,838
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 272
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,824, Number 59

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast