Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raffaele Barbieri

Deceased

Bishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1898Born
21 May 192122.6Ordained PriestPriest
30 Aug 193738.9AppointedBishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy
24 Oct 193739.0Ordained BishopBishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy
31 Jan 196869.3DiedBishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy

MicroData Summary for Raffaele Barbieri
Bishop Raffaele Barbieri (born , died ) Bishop of Cassano all’Jonio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Marco Argentano

  • a priest for 46.6 years
  • a bishop for 30.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1937, Number 66

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast