Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nunzio Galantino

President of the Administration of the Patrimony of the Apostolic See


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Aug 1948 Born
23 Dec 197224.3Ordained PriestPriest of Ascoli Satriano e Cerignola, Italy
9 Dec 201163.3AppointedBishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy
25 Feb 201263.5Ordained BishopBishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy
28 Feb 201566.5ResignedBishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy
26 Jun 201869.8AppointedPresident of the Administration of the Patrimony of the Apostolic See

MicroData Summary for Nunzio Galantino
Bishop Nunzio Galantino (born ) President of Administration of the Patrimony of the Apostolic See

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCerignola, Diocese of Ascoli Satriano e Cerignola, Italy
Ordained BishopCathedral, Cerignola, Diocese of Cerignola-Ascoli Satriano, Italy

Please contact the Bishop through the Administration of the Patrimony of the Apostolic See.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 9 Dec 2011
  • ob/c2: CB, 9 Dec 2011
  • c34: CB, 7 Feb 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Number 17,264
  • r: Bollettino, 28 Feb 2015
  • ab: Bollettino, 26 Jun 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 26 Jun 2018

Quantcast