Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop NicolÚ Rocco

Deceased

Bishop of Cassano all’Jonio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1655³BornNapoli
28 Oct 168025.8Ordained PriestPriest
22 Feb 170651.1AppointedBishop of Ravello e Scala, Italy
21 Feb 170752.1AppointedBishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy
Nov 1726³71.8DiedBishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for NicolÚ Rocco:
Bishop NicolÚ Rocco (born , died Nov 1726) Bishop of Cassano all’Jonio

  • a priest for 46.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 147, and Page 328
  • b: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1706, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 20 Jun 2015