Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Maria Bonito

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Amalfi, Italy

Titular Archbishop of Axomis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Nov 1852Born
22 May 187522.5Ordained PriestPriest
15 Jun 189946.5AppointedBishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy
25 Jun 189946.6Ordained BishopBishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy
11 Dec 190553.0AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Amalfi, Italy
11 Dec 190553.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Scythopolis
17 Jun 190855.5SucceededArchbishop of Amalfi, Italy
5 Aug 191057.7ResignedArchbishop of Amalfi, Italy
5 Aug 191057.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Axomis
14 Sep 191663.8DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Amalfi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Maria Bonito (VIAF: 307356184)
Archbishop Antonio Maria Bonito (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Amalfi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Ordained BishopFranciscaines, via Giusti, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 41.3 years
  • a bishop for 17.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1917
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 189
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 49, and Page 76
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1899, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 17 Jun 2017