Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfonso de Balmaseda, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Zamora, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Nov 1626³Born
16 Jun 167043.6AppointedBishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy
22 Jun 167043.6Ordained BishopBishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy
25 Sep 167346.8AppointedBishop of Gerona, Spain
24 Mar 167952.3SelectedBishop of Zamora, Spain
4 Sep 167952.8ConfirmedBishop of Zamora, Spain
13 Sep 168457.8DiedBishop of Zamora, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alfonso de Balmaseda
Bishop Alfonso de Balmaseda O.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop of Zamora

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLucena

  • a bishop for 14.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 147, and Page 209
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 422
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 205, Number 1,284
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1670, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast