Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Marion Cardinal del Giudice

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Pudenziana


Events

DateEventTitle
18 Feb 1370AppointedBishop of Castellammare di Stabia, Italy
18 May 1373AppointedBishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy
1378²RemovedBishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy
1379²AppointedArchbishop of Brindisi, Italy
4 Jun 1380AppointedArchbishop of Taranto, Italy
1383¹AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Pudenziana
1383¹Elevated to Cardinal
Dec 1385²DiedCardinal-Priest of Santa Pudenziana

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Marion del Giudice
Marion Cardinal del Giudice (died Dec 1385)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAmalfi
Death PlacePapal residence, Genoa

  • a cardinal for 2.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1383
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 462, and Page 170
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 149, and Page 473

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 2 Jun 2019

Quantcast