Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Bellusci

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Sinope


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Aug 1774BornFrascineto
26 Aug 179824.0Ordained PriestPriest
18 Sep 180733.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Sinope
9 Dec 180733.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sinope
2 Mar 183358.5DiedTitular Bishop of Sinope

MicroData Summary for Domenico Bellusci:
Bishop Domenico Bellusci (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Sinope

  • a priest for 34.5 years
  • a bishop for 25.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 347

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013