Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Salvatore Scanu

Deceased

Bishop of San Marco e Bisignano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Sep 1859BornOzieri
12 Apr 188424.6Ordained PriestPriest
30 Jun 190949.8AppointedBishop of San Marco e Bisignano, Italy
5 Sep 190950.0Ordained BishopBishop of San Marco e Bisignano, Italy
22 Jan 193272.4DiedBishop of San Marco e Bisignano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Salvatore Scanu:
Bishop Salvatore Scanu (born , died ) Bishop of San Marco e Bisignano

  • a priest for 47.8 years
  • a bishop for 22.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • op/ob: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1909, Number 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 29 Sep 2013