Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Savino

Bishop of Cassano all’Jonio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Nov 1954 BornBitonto
24 Aug 197823.7Ordained PriestPriest of Ruvo e Bitonto, Italy
30 Sep 198227.8IncardinatedPriest of Bitonto, Italy
30 Sep 198631.8IncardinatedPriest of Bari-Bitonto, Italy
28 Feb 201560.2AppointedBishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy
2 May 201560.4Ordained BishopBishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy
31 May 201560.5InstalledBishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Savino:
Bishop Francesco Savino (born ) Bishop of Cassano all’Jonio

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Cassano all’Jonio.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Feb 2015
  • ob: CB, 28 Feb 2015
  • c2+: CB, 22 Apr 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Number 18,489

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015