Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Oliva

Bishop of Locri-Gerace (-Santa Maria di Polsi)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jan 1951 BornAvena di Papasidero
5 Jan 197625.0Ordained PriestPriest of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy
5 May 201463.3AppointedBishop of Locri-Gerace (-Santa Maria di Polsi), Italy
20 Jul 201463.5Ordained BishopBishop of Locri-Gerace (-Santa Maria di Polsi), Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Oliva:
Bishop Francesco Oliva (born ) Bishop of Locri-Gerace (-Santa Maria di Polsi)

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Locri-Gerace (-Santa Maria di Polsi).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 5 May 2014
  • ob: CB, 8 May 2014
  • c2+: CB, 14 May 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 15 May 2014