Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Durante Cardinal Duranti

Deceased

Bishop of Brescia, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Oct 1507Born
25 Jun 153830.7AppointedBishop of Alghero, Italy
12 Mar 154032.4Ordained BishopBishop of Alghero, Italy
18 Feb 154133.3AppointedBishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy
19 Dec 154437.2Elevated to Cardinal
9 Jan 154537.2InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli
18 Feb 155143.3AppointedBishop of Brescia, Italy
24 Dec 1557³50.2DiedBishop of Brescia, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Durante Duranti (VIAF: 304914526)
Durante Cardinal Duranti (born , died ) Bishop of Brescia

EventPlace
Birth PlacePalazzolo, Diocese of Brescia
Death PlaceBrescia, Diocese of Brescia
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Brescia, Diocese of Brescia

  • a bishop for 17.7 years
  • a cardinal for 13.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Dec 1544
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 156
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,807
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Number 17,457
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1540, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 22 Jul 2017