Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anton Schlembach

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Speyer, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Feb 1932Born
10 Oct 195624.6Ordained PriestPriest of Würzburg, Germany
25 Aug 198351.5AppointedBishop of Speyer, Germany
16 Oct 198351.6Ordained BishopBishop of Speyer, Germany
10 Feb 200775.0RetiredBishop of Speyer, Germany
15 Jun 202088.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Speyer, Germany

MicroData Summary for Anton Schlembach
Bishop Anton Schlembach (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Speyer

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGroßwenkheim
Ordained BishopAssumption, Cathedral, Speyer, Diocese of Speyer
Death PlaceSpeyer, Diocese of Speyer

  • a priest for 63.6 years
  • a bishop for 36.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 10 Feb 2007
  • d: CB, 15 Jun 2020
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 82, Number 6,753

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast