Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alois Brems

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Eichstätt, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Apr 1906Born
29 Jun 193024.1Ordained PriestPriest of Eichstätt, Germany
28 May 196862.1AppointedBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
6 Jul 196862.2Ordained BishopBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
1 Jun 198377.1RetiredBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
1 Jun 198377.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Eichstätt, Germany
17 Apr 198477.9CeasedApostolic Administrator of Eichstätt, Germany
16 Feb 198780.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Eichstätt, Germany

MicroData Summary for Alois Brems
Bishop Alois Brems (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Eichstätt

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZiegelhof
Ordained BishopEichstätt, Diocese of Eichstätt

  • a priest for 56.6 years
  • a bishop for 18.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 438

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast