Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Isidor Markus Emanuel

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Speyer, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Oct 1905Born
26 Oct 193025.0Ordained PriestPriest of Speyer, Germany
22 Dec 195247.2AppointedBishop of Speyer, Germany
1 Feb 195347.3Ordained BishopBishop of Speyer, Germany
10 Feb 196862.3ResignedBishop of Speyer, Germany
10 Feb 196862.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Marazanae
30 Nov 197065.1ResignedTitular Bishop of Marazanae
30 Nov 199186.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Speyer, Germany

MicroData Summary
Isidor Markus Emanuel
Bishop Isidor Markus Emanuel
(born , died )
Bishop Emeritus of Speyer

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMerzalben, Diocese of Speyer
Ordained BishopCathedral, Speyer, Diocese of Speyer

  • a priest for 61.0 years
  • a bishop for 38.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 433, Ascendance
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1953, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 28 Apr 2025