Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ernst Gutting

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Speyer

Titular Bishop of Sufar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jan 1919BornLudwigshafen
3 Jul 194930.4Ordained PriestPriest of Speyer, Germany
31 May 197152.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Speyer, Germany
31 May 197152.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Sufar
12 Sep 197152.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sufar
25 Feb 199475.1RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Speyer, Germany
27 Sep 201394.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Speyer, Germany

MicroData Summary for Ernst Gutting:
Bishop Ernst Gutting (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Speyer

  • a priest for 64.2 years
  • a bishop for 42.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 28 Sep 2013