Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Hermann Cardinal Volk

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Mainz

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Fabiano e Venanzio a Villa Fiorelli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Dec 1903BornSteinheim
2 Apr 192723.2Ordained PriestPriest of Mainz, Germany
3 Mar 196258.1SelectedBishop of Mainz, Germany
25 Mar 196258.2ConfirmedBishop of Mainz, Germany
5 Jun 196258.4Ordained BishopBishop of Mainz, Germany
5 Mar 197369.1Elevated to Cardinal
5 Mar 197369.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Fabiano e Venanzio a Villa Fiorelli
27 Dec 198279.0RetiredBishop of Mainz, Germany
1 Jul 198884.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Mainz, Germany

MicroData Summary for Hermann Volk:
Hermann Cardinal Volk (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Mainz

  • a priest for 61.2 years
  • a bishop for 26.0 years
  • a cardinal for 15.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c3+: CB
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 110, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 71

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015