Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stanisław Napierała

Bishop Emeritus of Kalisz


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Dec 1936 BornKalwy
27 May 196124.4Ordained PriestPriest of Poznań, Poland
25 Aug 198043.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Poznań, Poland
25 Aug 198043.6AppointedTitular Bishop of San Leone
5 Oct 198043.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of San Leone
25 Mar 199255.2AppointedBishop of Kalisz, Poland
21 Jul 201275.5RetiredBishop of Kalisz, Poland

MicroData Summary for Stanisław Napierała:
Bishop Stanisław Napierała (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Kalisz

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kalisz.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 21 Jul 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015