Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacek Pyl, O.M.I.

Auxiliary Bishop of Odessa-Simferopol, Ukraine

Titular Bishop of Nova Sinna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Aug 1962 Born
8 Sep 198220.0ProfessedMember of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
8 Sep 198624.0Perpetual VowsMember of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
17 Jun 198724.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
20 Jun 198825.8Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
23 Nov 201250.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Odessa-Simferopol, Ukraine
23 Nov 201250.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Nova Sinna
5 Jan 201350.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nova Sinna

MicroData Summary for Jacek Pyl
Bishop Jacek Pyl O.M.I. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Odessa-Simferopol

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGarwolin, Poland
Ordained BishopCathedral, Odessa, Diocese of Odessa-Simferopol

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Odessa-Simferopol.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 23 Nov 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Number 17,623
  • od/prof: CB, 6 Dec 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018